EP1318107 - Blow head mechanism of a glass container forming machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emhart Glass S.A. Hinterbergstrasse 22 6330 Cham / CH | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fenton, F. Alan 38 Zimmer Road Granby, Connecticut 06035 / US | 02 /
Hyre, Matthew R. 304 Anderson Drive Lexington, Virginia 24450 / US | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 19 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258314.0 | 03.12.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | US20010006603 | 05.12.2001 Original published format: US 6603 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1318107 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1318107 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318107 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/36, C03B9/38 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
C03B9/3858 (EP,US);
C03B9/3681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/13] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blaskopfmechanismus einer Hohlglasformmaschine | [2003/24] | English: | Blow head mechanism of a glass container forming machine | [2003/24] | French: | Méchanisme d'un tête de soufflage d'une machine à façonner le verre creux | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2123145 (PEILER KARL E) [X] 1-5 * page 2, lines 10-55 *; | [X]US2347181 (COX JR HARRY P) [X] 1-5 * page 2, lines 26-65; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR1350353 (CORNING GLASS WORKS) [X] 1-5 * page 1, paragraphs LAST,PARAGRAPH; figure 1 *; | [X]FR2147020 (VIDRIERIA ROVIRA SA) [X] 1-5 * page 2, lines 28-39; figure 2 *; | [X]US4708730 (ZIEGLER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-5* column 6, lines 45-68; figures 5,6 *; | [DX]US5807419 (RODRIGUEZ-WONG GASPAR [MX], et al) [DX] 1-5 * column 3, lines 44-47 - column 4, lines 3-9; figure 2 * |