|
24.06.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
25.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |