EP1318629 - Method and system for determining autonomous system transit volumes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | ||
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCollom, William Girard 1442 Silk Oak Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | 02 /
Hunt, Joseph Ronald 1339 Saint John Place Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | 03 /
Tudor, Alexander Lawrence 2149 Junction Avenue No. 9 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
Tatman, Lance Anthony 891 Old Canyon Road Fremont, CA 84536 / US | 05 /
Woodcock, William E. 2355 Virginia Street Berkeley, CA 94709-1315 / US | [2003/37] |
Former [2003/24] | 01 /
McCollom, William Girard 1442 Silk Oak Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | ||
02 /
Hunt, Joseph Ronald 5239 Hahns Peak Drive, no 205 Loveland, co 80538 / US | |||
03 /
Tudor, Alexander Lawrence 2149 Junction Avenue No. 9 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
04 /
Tatman, Lance Anthony 891 Old Canyon Road Fremont, CA 84536 / US | |||
05 /
Woodcock, William E. 2355 Virginia Street Berkeley, CA 94709-1315 / US | Representative(s) | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell 44 Prespect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258400.7 | 05.12.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | US20010016958 | 07.12.2001 Original published format: US 16958 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1318629 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1318629 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318629 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/41] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Festellung von Durchgangsdatenmengen für ein autonomes System | [2006/12] | English: | Method and system for determining autonomous system transit volumes | [2003/24] | French: | Procédé et système pour la détermination des volumes en passage d'une système autonome | [2006/13] |
Former [2003/24] | Verfahren und vorrichtung zur Festellung Durchgangdatenmenge für eine autonomsystem | ||
Former [2003/24] | Procede et systeme pour la determination des volumes en passage d'une systeme autonome | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY] - BHATTACHARYYA S ET AL, "Pop-level and access-link-level traffic dynamics in a Tier-1 POP", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST ACM SIGCOMM INTERNET MEASUREMENT WORKSHOP. UMW 2001, PROCEEDINGS OF ACM SIGCOMM INTERNET MEASUREMENT WORKSHOP 2001, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 1-2 NOV. 2001, 2001, New York, NY, USA, ACM, USA, pages 39 - 53, XP002260896 [X] 1,3 * figure 3 * * page 41, column R, line 6 - line 10 * * page 41, column R, line 21 - page 42, column L, line 1 * * page 42, column L, line 20 - column R, line 23 * * page 42, column R, line 40 - line 43 * * page 43, column R, line 21 - line 26 * [A] 2,4,7,8 [Y] 5,6,9,10 | [Y] - GAO L, "ON INFERRING AUTONOMOUS SYSTEM RELATIONSHIP IN THE INTERNET", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200112), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 733 - 745, XP001087286 [Y] 5,6,9,10 * page 736, column L, line 23 - line 28 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.974527 | Examination | - NAVARRO J.P.; NICKLESS B.; WINKLER L., "Combining Cisco Netflow Exports with Relational Database Technology for Usage Statistics, Intrusion Detection and Network Forensics", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION CONFERENCE. LISA, (20001203), pages 285 - 290, XP002241720 |