EP1318038 - Climate control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION One Carrier Place Farmington Connecticut 06034-4015 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El-Habhab, Hussein 2, Square Prevot de la Moissonniere 76130 Mont Saint Aignan / FR | 02 /
Stumpf, Andre Georges 15, rue des Belges 76240 Bonsecours / FR | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2003/24] | Leckey, David H. Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EV4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258511.1 | 10.12.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | US20010016400 | 10.12.2001 Original published format: US 16400 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1318038 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318038 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, B60H1/00 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B60H1/00014 (EP,US);
B60H1/00885 (EP,US);
B60H1/323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | Regelungssystem für eine Klimaanlage | [2003/24] | English: | Climate control system | [2003/24] | French: | Système de commande de climatisation | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 04.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Request for further processing for: | 16.11.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2006 | Decision despatched | 09.09.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2005 | Decision despatched | 24.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | CH | 14.02.2007 | CY | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | EE | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | SI | 14.02.2007 | SK | 14.02.2007 | TR | 14.02.2007 | SE | 14.05.2007 | BG | 15.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5129235 (RENKEN DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10* column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 47; figure 9 *; | [X]US5168713 (HOWLAND LELAND L [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 20 - column 11, line 29; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]US5172559 (RENKEN DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,15 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-3 * * column 4, lines 56-62; figure 1 * | Examination | US3543838 |