EP1324263 - Data processing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONY UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Sony United Kingdom Limited The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelly, Jason Charles 9 Farnsfield Close, Lower Earley Reading, Berkshire RG6 4DR / GB | 02 /
Tapson, Daniel Warren 31 Pembroke Road Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 8QH / GB | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr. D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258557.4 | 11.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | GB20010029841 | 13.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0129841 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1324263 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1324263 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
H04N1/32154 (EP,US);
G06T1/0071 (EP,US);
H04N1/32165 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0052 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0063 (EP,US);
H04N2201/324 (EP,US);
H04N2201/327 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/05] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsgerät und -verfahren | [2003/27] | English: | Data processing apparatus and method | [2003/27] | French: | Appareil et méthode de traitement de données | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/07] | 13.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.03.2016 | 09.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0033282 (SIGNAFY INC [US]) [Y] 5 * page 6, line 5 - line 10 *; | [XY]EP1098522 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7,17,18,20-25 * figures 1,2 * * page 8 * [Y] 2-6,8,9; | [Y] - DUAN F Y ET AL, "Intra-block algorithm for digital watermarking", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTEENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BRISBANE, QLD., AUSTRALIA 16-20 AUG. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980816), ISBN 0-8186-8512-3, pages 1589 - 1591, XP010297885 [Y] 6 * Section 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.1998.712016 | [Y] - HAITSMA J ET AL, "A watermarking scheme for digital cinema", PROCEEDINGS 2001 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 2001. THESSALONIKI, GREECE, OCT. 7 - 10, 2001, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20011007), vol. 1 OF 3. CONF. 8, ISBN 0-7803-6725-1, pages 487 - 489, XP010563804 [Y] 8,9 * Section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2001.958534 | [Y] - BAITELLO R ET AL, "From watermark detection to watermark decoding: a PPM approach", SIGNAL PROCESSING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200106), vol. 81, no. 6, ISSN 0165-1684, pages 1261 - 1271, XP004241226 [Y] 2-4 * Section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-1684(01)00043-3 | [A] - KALKER T ET AL, "A VIDEO WATERMARKING SYSTEM FOR BROADCAST MONITORING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19990125), vol. 3657, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 103 - 112, XP000949142 [A] 1-25 * Section 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.344661 |