Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
26.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
03.08.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
26.07.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
26.07.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
30.03.2007 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.12.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
13.12.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.08.2006 | First examination report | |
15.08.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
14.12.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.11.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
23.09.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
18.02.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
15.12.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.05.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |