Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1324555 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2007 | B1 | EP1324555 | 06.04.2005 | A3 | EP1324555 | 02.07.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US2579501 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2414496 | 26.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2579501 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60222228T | 29.05.2008 | T2 | DE60222228D1 | 18.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US2579501 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7062165 | 13.06.2006 | B2 | US2004091273 | 13.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2579501 | 26.12.2001 |