EP1324555 - System and method for regenerating data with monitoring and optimization using forward error correction information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brissette, Patrice 6 Contrefort, Apt. 2 Hull, Quebec J8Z 1Z7 / CA | 02 /
Thomson, Sandy A. 1262 Greyrock Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2C 2A3 / CA | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258783.6 | 19.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | US20010025795 | 26.12.2001 Original published format: US 25795 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1324555 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1324555 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1324555 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/06, H04L1/20 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
H04L1/208 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/0047 (EP,US);
H04L25/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/52] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenregenerationsanordnung und -Verfahren mit Überwachung und Optimierung mittels Vorwärtsfehlerkorrekturinformationen | [2003/27] | English: | System and method for regenerating data with monitoring and optimization using forward error correction information | [2003/27] | French: | Système et procédé de régénération de données avec optimisation et surveillance au moyen d'informations de correction en aval des erreurs | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 17.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.12.2007 | FR | 02.05.2008 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/44] | FR | 02.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03239081 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11,15* abstract *; | [X]WO9912315 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,11-15 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 33 * * page 6, line 4 - line 16 * * page 7, line 10 - line 24; figures 2,5 *; | [X]EP1085713 (MARCONI COMM LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10,11,15 * column 1, line 7 - line 20 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 49 * * figures 2-4 * |