EP1323894 - Supplemental seal for the chordal hinge seals in a gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/11] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohammed-Fakir, Abdul-Azeez 6C3 Sheridan Village Schenectady, New York 12308 / US | 02 /
Safi, Ahmad R-4 Hassan Apart.Ext.,Block 13-D, Gulshan-e-Iqbal Karchi / PA | 03 /
Fang, Ning 8628 Rupp Farm Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 04 /
Aksit, Mahmut Faruk Isfasyin Cad. 13/36 Erenkoy, Istanbul 81070 / TR | 05 /
Vedantam, Srikanth 2475 Brookshire Drive, 70-07 Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | [2003/33] |
Former [2003/27] | 01 /
Mohammed-Fakir, Abdul-Azeez 6C3 Sheridan Village Schenectady, New York 12308 / US | ||
02 /
Safi, Ahmad 229 Hoosick Street Troy, New York 12180 / US | |||
03 /
Fang, Ning 8628 Rupp Farm Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | |||
04 /
Aksit, Mahmut Faruk Isfasyin Cad. 13/36 Erenkoy, Istanbul 81070 / TR | |||
05 /
Vedantam, Srikanth 2475 Brookshire Drive, 70-07 Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2003/27] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258863.6 | 23.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | US20010029003 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: US 29003 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323894 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323894 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323894 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F02C7/28, F16J15/08 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
F16J15/0887 (EP,US);
F01D11/00 (KR);
F01D11/005 (EP,US);
F02C7/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/01] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusatzdichtung für Statorelemente einer Gasturbine | [2003/27] | English: | Supplemental seal for the chordal hinge seals in a gas turbine | [2003/27] | French: | Dispositif auxiliaire d'étanchéité pour les éléments statoriques d'une turbine à gaz | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 24.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4445694 (FLAHERTY ROBERT [US]) [A] 9,10* the whole document *; | [X]US5372476 (HEMMELGARN ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure - * * column 3, line 53 - line 56 *; | [A]US5716052 (SWENSEN JEFFREY E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure - * * column 8, line 1 - column 10, line 9 *; | [A]US6164656 (FROST WILSON [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US6237921 (LIOTTA GARY C [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figure - * * column 1, line 30 - line 35 * * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 9 - line 19 *; | [X]US6287091 (SVIHLA GARY R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7 * figure - * * column 2, line 36 - line 54 *; | [E]EP1327748 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1-10 * the whole document * |