EP1323916 - Control system for choke valve of carburetor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/21] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Hiroaki, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Moriyama, Hiroshi, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Tamamoto, Ryuhei, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Piésold, Alexander J. Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258972.5 | 24.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | JP20010397757 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001397757 | JP20010397758 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001397758 | JP20010397759 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001397759 | JP20010397760 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001397760 | JP20020207147 | 16.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002207147 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323916 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323916 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323916 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02M1/10 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
F02M19/122 (EP,US);
F02M1/10 (EP,US);
F16F9/12 (EP,US);
F16F9/53 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/07] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuersystem für die Starterklappe eines Vergasers | [2003/27] | English: | Control system for choke valve of carburetor | [2003/27] | French: | Système de régulation pour le starter d'un carburateur | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 05.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Request for further processing for: | 14.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3147320 (JOHN TUBB REGINALD) [A] 1-14 * figure - * * column 4, line 63 - line L *; | [A]US3575391 (BRAUN PAUL E, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 34 *; | [XA]US3837322 (SHISHIDO T, et al) [X] 1,3,4,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 46 * [A] 2,5-7,9-14; | [XAY]US3907944 (NAKADA MASAHIKO) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 2 * [A] 2,4-9,11-14 [Y] 10; | [A]US4515126 (KESSLER JOCHEN [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 20 *; | [YA]US5309875 (GAULT ROGER T [US]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - line 32 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 63 * * column 5, line 22 - line 62 * [A] 1-9,11-14 | by applicant | JPS6324354U |