EP1347626 - A system and method for seamless audio retrieval and transmittal during wireless application protocol sessions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Openwave Systems Inc. 1400 Seaport Boulevard, Office no. W4152 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stein, Lawrence M. 1149 Greenbrier Road San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 02 /
Nobrega, Ryan 2728 Waltham Cross Belmont, California 94002 / US | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02259040.0 | 31.12.2002 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | US20020104791 | 22.03.2002 Original published format: US 104791 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1347626 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1347626 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/493 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
H04M3/53333 (EP,US);
H04M3/487 (EP,US);
H04M7/00 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US);
H04M3/533 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | H04M7/00, H04M3/487, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/01] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum nahtlosen Auffinden und Senden von Audiosignalen während WAP-Sitzungen | [2003/39] | English: | A system and method for seamless audio retrieval and transmittal during wireless application protocol sessions | [2003/39] | French: | Système et méthode pour retrouver et transmettre d'une façon continue de signaux audio pendant des sessions WAP | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 23.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1168794 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * columns 1,2, paragraphs 1,6,7 * * column 3, paragraphs 11,15 * * column 4, paragraph 17 - column 5, paragraph 21 * * figures 3,4a,4b *; | [X]WO0215519 (MOBILEUM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 8, lines 6-29 * * page 12, line 12 - page 14, line 8 * * page 21, line 20 - page 23, line 29 * * page 25, line 30 - page 29, line 29 * * page 39, line 7 - page 40, line 24 * * page 67, lines 12-25 * * figures 2-5,8A-8H *; | [A] - "Wireless Application Protocol - Wireless Telephony Application Specification - Draft Version", WAP WTA DRAFT VERSION, XX, XX, (19980430), pages 1 - 31, XP002128849 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * |