Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1227205 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2008 | B1 | EP1227205 | 31.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0101136 | 29.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE392521T | 15.05.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0101136 | 29.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60226083T | 25.06.2009 | T2 | DE60226083D1 | 29.05.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0101136 | 29.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2820162 | 11.04.2003 | B1 | FR2820162 | 02.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0101136 | 29.01.2001 |