EP1227205 - Mounting device for fences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault Equipements Equestres Sarl Les Pleux 77510 St Denis Les Rebais / FR | [2002/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renault, Philippe, François Louis 34, Les Pleux 77510 St Denis Les Rebais / FR | 02 /
Renault, Vincent Bernard Joseph 25, La Brosse 77510 St Denis Les Rebais / FR | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Vander-Heym, Serge Henri Marcel Cabinet Vander-Heym 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Vander-Heym, Serge 172, Boulevard Voltaire 75011 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02290158.1 | 23.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | FR20010001136 | 29.01.2001 Original published format: FR 0101136 | [2002/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227205 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227205 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04H17/14, E01F15/04 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
E04H17/1413 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Title | German: | Montageteil für Zäune | [2002/31] | English: | Mounting device for fences | [2002/31] | French: | Piece d'assemblage pour la réalisation de clotures | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IE | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 27.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08302632 ; | [A]JPH11152718 ; | [A]US3127870 (PHILIP BIEBER) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]US4368875 (WEISS JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 13 - line 50 ** column 5, line 35 - line 41; figures 1,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08302632 A 19961119 (TOA STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11152718 A 19990608 (SHOWA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |