EP1233011 - Process for the synthesis of hydrocarbons in presence of a catalyst comprising a metal of group VIII supported by silica-alumina [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00186 Roma / IT | |||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states IFP Energies Nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00186 Roma / IT | |||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00186 Roma / IT | |||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00186 Roma / IT | |||
For all designated states AGIP PETROLI S.p.A. Via Laurentina 449 00142 Roma / IT | |||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00186 Roma / IT | |||
For all designated states AGIP PETROLI S.p.A. Via Laurentina 449 00142 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roy-Auberger, Magalie Résidence le Kerylos,23 Avenue du Maréchal Leclerc 38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | 02 /
Courty, Philippe 58, rue Jean Baptiste Baudin 94800 Villejuif / FR | 03 /
Revel, Renaud 30, rue Desaix 78800 Houilles / FR | 04 /
Zennaro, Roberto Calle Zugna Sant'Elena 12 Venezia / IT | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/08] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2002/51] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/34] | Andréeff, François, et al Département Brevets, Institut Français du Petrole, 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 02290205.0 | 29.01.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | FR20010002241 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102241 | [2002/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233011 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233011 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/21] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1233011 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/04 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
C10G2/331 (EP);
B01J21/12 (EP);
B01J23/74 (EP);
B01J35/615 (EP);
B01J37/03 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP);
C07C1/0445 (EP);
C10G2/332 (EP);
C10G2/333 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, GB, IT, NL [2003/20] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Synthese von Kohlenwasserstoffen in Gegenwart eines Katalysators der ein Metall von Gruppe VIII auf Kieselsäure-Tonerde enthält | [2002/34] | English: | Process for the synthesis of hydrocarbons in presence of a catalyst comprising a metal of group VIII supported by silica-alumina | [2002/34] | French: | Procédé de synthèse d'hydrocarbures en présence d'un catalyseur comprenant un metal du groupe VIII supporte sur silice-alumine | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2008
ADMISSIBLE Sasol Technology (Pty) Limited 1 Klasie Havenga Road PO Box 1 Sasolbourg 8570 / ZA Opponent's representative Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2008
ADMISSIBLE Sasol Technology (Pty) Limited 1 Klasie Havenga Road PO Box 1 Sasolbourg 8570 / ZA Opponent's representative Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | 06.06.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.02.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.12.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.04.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.02.2011 | Appeal received No. T0446/11 | 17.11.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4497903 (KIBBY CHARLES L [US], et al); | [AD]WO9942214 (SASOL TECH PTY LTD [ZA], et al) | Opposition | EP0979807 | EP1126008 |