EP1231107 - Headlamp unit for vehicle with improved headlamp fastening means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faurecia Bloc Avant 2, rue Hennape 92000 Nanterre / FR | [2004/42] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Faurecia Industries 276, rue Louis Blériot 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berne, Sébastien 20, rue Velotte 25200 Montbeliard / FR | 02 /
Riviere, Caroline 41, rue des Graviers 25700 Valentigney / FR | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02290260.5 | 04.02.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | FR20010001728 | 08.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0101728 | [2002/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1231107 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1231107 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/04 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
B60Q1/06 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0064 (EP,US);
B60Q2200/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/19] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kfz-Beleuchtungseinheit mit verbesserten Mitteln zur Befestigung der Scheinwerfer | [2002/33] | English: | Headlamp unit for vehicle with improved headlamp fastening means | [2002/33] | French: | Bloc optique de véhicule comportant des moyens de fixation de projecteurs améliorés | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0649773 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5428511 (LUALLIN JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 33-51 * * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 34 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19632688 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 37-42 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 27 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5702174 (DOBLER KARL-OTTO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 59-67 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 13 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO0007844 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 3 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, lines 18-27 * * page 7, lines 16-18 * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 11 * * page 10, lines 1-3 ** figures 3-14,19-26 * |