EP1233282 - System with distributed transmit and receive antennas, in particular for radar with synthetic emission and beamforming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2002/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desodt, Guy, c/o Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Laurent Jacques Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Lucas, Laurent Jacques Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/34] | Lucas, Laurent Jacques Thales Intellectual Property, 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02290272.0 | 05.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | FR20010002177 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102177 | [2002/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233282 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233282 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/42, G01S13/28, H01Q25/00 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
G01S13/87 (EP,US);
G01S13/28 (EP);
G01S13/426 (EP);
H01Q25/002 (EP);
G01S13/91 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit verteilten Sende- und Empfangsantennen, insbesondere für Radar mit synthetischer Emission und Strahlbildung | [2010/24] | English: | System with distributed transmit and receive antennas, in particular for radar with synthetic emission and beamforming | [2002/34] | French: | Système à émission et réception réparties, notamment radar à émission synthétique et à formation de faisceau par le calcul | [2002/34] |
Former [2002/34] | Vorrichtung mit verteilten Sende- und Empfangsantennen, insbesondere für Radar mit synthetischer Emission and Strahlbildung | Examination procedure | 20.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | IT | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | LU | 05.02.2011 | GB | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LU | 05.02.2011 | ||
GB | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GB | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0423552 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * * page 3, line 34 - line 39 * * page 4, line 42 - line 49 *; | [AD]FR2709835 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [AD] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2766017 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * * column 12, line 21 - column 13, line 4 *; | [A]US5997479 (SAVORD BERNARD J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 2 * * column 15, line 12 - line 34 *; | [A] - YOUNIS M ET AL, "Antenna system for a forward looking SAR using digital beamforming on-receive-only", IGARSS 2000. IEEE 2000 INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM. TAKING THE PULSE OF THE PLANET: THE ROLE OF REMOTE SENSING IN MANAGING THE ENVIRONMENT. PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.00CH37120), IGARSS 2000. IEEE 2000 INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND, 2000, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-6359-0, pages 2343 - 2345 vol.5, XP002182205 [A] 1 * Paragraphe IV: "The Antenna System"; page 2344 ; figure 2 * |