EP1343178 - Electrical cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudorf, Uwe, Dr. Guntherstrasse 15 16321 Lindenberg / DE | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02290563.2 | 06.03.2002 | [2003/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1343178 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1343178 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/18 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
H01B7/1895 (EP);
H01B7/1885 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Kabel | [2003/37] | English: | Electrical cable | [2003/37] | French: | Câble électrique | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 22.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.09.2004 | IT | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | TR | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 06.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/38] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IT | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IE | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IE | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3144743 (LAPP KG U I [DE]) [A] 1-6* page 5, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US5313020 (SACKETT JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 35 - column 8, line 33; figures 6,7 * |