EP1247546 - Process and system for fire-fighting in a plane compartment equipped with said system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lessi, Stéphane 32, rue Gabriel Péri 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Vandroux, Olivier 21, rue du Général Mangin 38100 Grenoble / FR | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A., Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A., Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02290716.6 | 21.03.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | FR20010004450 | 02.04.2001 Original published format: FR 0104450 | [2002/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1247546 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1247546 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A62C3/08 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
A62C99/0018 (EP,US);
A62C3/08 (EP,US);
B64D25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Brandbekämpfung in einem Flugzeugabteil, das mit dieser Vorrichtung ausgerüstet ist | [2002/41] | English: | Process and system for fire-fighting in a plane compartment equipped with said system | [2002/41] | French: | Procédé et installation de traitement d'un feu dans un compartiment d'aéronef équipé d'une telle installation | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 11.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.2006
22.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE WAGNER Alarm- und Sicherungssysteme GmbH Schleswigstrasse 5 D-30853 Langenhagen / DE Opponent's representative Rupprecht, Kay, et al, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.2006
WAGNER Alarm- und Sicherungssysteme GmbH Schleswigstrasse 5 D-30853 Langenhagen / DE Opponent's representative Rupprecht, Kay, et al, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | 21.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.01.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.01.2007 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 27.02.2007 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.02.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.05.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/37] | Appeal following opposition | 28.09.2009 | Appeal received No. T1978/09 | 30.11.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.03.2011 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2011/10] | 22.04.2011 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2011/17] | 11.09.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: closure of the opposition procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.11.2005 | CY | 16.11.2005 | FI | 16.11.2005 | IE | 16.11.2005 | IT | 16.11.2005 | NL | 16.11.2005 | TR | 16.11.2005 | DK | 16.02.2006 | GR | 16.02.2006 | SE | 16.02.2006 | ES | 27.02.2006 | BE | 31.03.2006 | CH | 31.03.2006 | LI | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | PT | 17.04.2006 | GB | 21.03.2010 | FR | 31.03.2010 | DE | 01.10.2010 | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/13] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CY | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
DE | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CY | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2009/02] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CY | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5040611 (STEEL JAMES [GB]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US5845714 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5918680 (SHEINSON RONALD S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6003608 (CUNNINGHAM JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |