EP1245441 - Elliptical-type vehicle headlight that can create several light beams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albou, Pierre c/o Valeo Vision, 34 rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/45] |
Former [2002/40] | Kohn, Philippe Cabinet Philippe Kohn, 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | Application number, filing date | 02290785.1 | 28.03.2002 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | FR20010004474 | 29.03.2001 Original published format: FR 0104474 | [2002/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1245441 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/12 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
B60Q1/18 (EP,US);
B60Q1/12 (EP,US);
B60Q1/122 (EP,US);
F21S41/365 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/054 (EP,US);
F21S41/336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Title | German: | Elliptischer Scheinwerfer der mehrere Lichtbündel bilden kann | [2002/40] | English: | Elliptical-type vehicle headlight that can create several light beams | [2002/40] | French: | Projecteur du type elliptique pour véhicule automobile, susceptible d'engendrer plusieurs faisceaux lumineux | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 08.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 22.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06176602 ; | [A]FR2797029 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 1-29 * * page 4, lines 21-32 * * page 6, lines 17-30 * * page 9, lines 3-27 * * page 10, lines 8-13 * * figures 1,2,9,10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940928), vol. 018, no. 514, Database accession no. (M - 1680), & JP06176602 A 19940624 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,10 * | by applicant | FR2735849 |