EP1359132 - Composites, applications, and process for manufacturing said composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROPEAN COMMUNITY 200, Rue de la Loi 1049 Brussels / BE | [2003/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veyret, Jean-Bernard Oranjelaan 23 1862 EZ Bergen / NL | 02 /
Rak, Zbigniew Fr. Zeilemakerstraat 68 1827 PH Alkmaar / NL | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291081.4 | 30.04.2002 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359132 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/80, F28F21/04, F16D69/02, F16J15/34, C04B35/83, C04B35/571, C04B35/589, C04B35/524 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
F16D69/023 (EP,US);
C04B35/524 (EP,US);
C04B35/571 (EP,US);
C04B35/589 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B35/83 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2004/31] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbundwerkstoffe, Anwendungen, und Verfahren zur Herstellung der genannten Verbundwerkstoffe | [2003/45] | English: | Composites, applications, and process for manufacturing said composites | [2003/45] | French: | Composites, applications, et leur procédé de fabrication | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04154662 ; | JPS63277564 [ ] (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN); | [X]EP0307968 (PETOCA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]US5196235 (PARLIER MICHEL [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-5,10,11 * * column 4, line 1 - line 27 * * column 5, line 4 - line 10 * * column 6, line 18 - line 34 *; | [X] - K. SUZUKI ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INT. EDITION, (1998), vol. 106, pages 364 - 368, XP000847778 [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920916), vol. 016, no. 443, Database accession no. (C - 0985), & JP04154662 A 19920527 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890320), Database accession no. 110:100541k, URL: STN, XP000019139 [X] 1-8 * abstract * |