Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1258695 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2006 | B1 | EP1258695 | 20.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0106688 | 18.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE335985T | 15.09.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0106688 | 18.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60213709T | 16.08.2007 | T2 | DE60213709D1 | 21.09.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0106688 | 18.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2824898 | 12.09.2003 | B1 | FR2824898 | 22.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0106688 | 18.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6644204 | 11.11.2003 | B2 | US2002170455 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0106688 | 18.05.2001 |