EP1258695 - Boat tail for ammunition provided with an electric igniter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIAT Industries 13, route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | [2006/32] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states GIAT INDUSTRIES 13, route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pierrot, Jean-François 558 route de Berry Bouy 18230 Saint Doulchard / FR | 02 /
Taillandier, Jean-Luc 13 rue Victor Hugo 18110 Fussy / FR | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie, 13 route de la Minière, BP 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291111.9 | 03.05.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | FR20010006688 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: FR 0106688 | [2002/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1258695 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1258695 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F42B5/08, F42C19/12 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
F42B5/181 (EP,US);
F42B5/08 (EP,US);
F42C19/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Title | German: | Geschossboden für eine mit einem elektrischen Zünder versehene Munition | [2002/47] | English: | Boat tail for ammunition provided with an electric igniter | [2002/47] | French: | Culot pour munition destiné à recevoir un allumeur électrique | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 22.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2006 | CY | 09.08.2006 | FI | 09.08.2006 | IE | 09.08.2006 | IT | 09.08.2006 | NL | 09.08.2006 | TR | 09.08.2006 | DK | 09.11.2006 | GR | 10.11.2006 | ES | 20.11.2006 | PT | 09.01.2007 | LU | 03.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
CY | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
LU | 03.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
ES | 20.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2056631 (BUCK CHEM TECH WERKE) [A] 1* page 4, lines 62-75; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0310517 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 46; figures 2-8 *; | [A]WO9530874 (GEN DYNAMICS LAND SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,8 * page 19, lines 13-20; figures 20,21 *; | [X]DE19853291 (TZN FORSCHUNG & ENTWICKLUNG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8 * column 2, lines 4-30; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US5355764 | US5503081 | EP0905470 | FR20000004735 |