EP1259088 - Method for notifying the arrival of an event to a mobile terminal, and mobile terminal for this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/47] | Procédé de notification de l'arrivée d'un événement sur un terminal mobile, et terminal mobile pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | ||
[2003/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road, Tsim Sha Tsui,Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2006/38] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states TAM Holdings Limited Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valade, Eric 6, rue Pechers 72190 Sarge Les, Le Mans / FR | 02 /
Bonnard, Pierre 6bis, rue Pierre Dupont 92150 Suresnes / FR | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/10] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 44-52, rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/47] | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al Compagnie Financière Alcatel Département Propriété Industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291134.1 | 06.05.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | FR20010006304 | 14.05.2001 Original published format: FR 0106304 | [2002/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259088 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1259088 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259088 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M1/72448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Meldung des Eingangs eines Ereignis zu einem Mobilgerät, und Mobilgerät für diese Verfahren | [2003/03] | English: | Method for notifying the arrival of an event to a mobile terminal, and mobile terminal for this method | [2003/03] | French: | Procédé de notification de l'arrivée d'un événement sur un terminal mobile, et terminal mobile pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/47] | Verfahren zur Meldung des Eingangs eines Ereignis zu einem Mobilgerät, und Mobilgerät für diese Verfahren | ||
Former [2002/47] | Procédé de notification de l'arrivée d'un événement sur un terminal mobile, et terminal mobile pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | ||
Former [2002/47] | Method for notifying the arrival of an event to a mobile terminal, and mobile terminal for this method | Examination procedure | 20.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 23.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2006 | CY | 20.09.2006 | NL | 20.09.2006 | TR | 20.09.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.12.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | LU | 06.05.2007 | IE | 07.05.2007 | BE | 31.05.2007 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
CY | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
LU | 06.05.2007 | ||
IE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
IE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 20.09.2006 | |
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | SE | 20.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19749730 (BORDFELD HUBERTUS [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US6061570 (JANOW RICHARD H [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 43 - line 63 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO0033468 (BITTACHON HOLDING INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 3 * * page 7, line 18 - line 22 * |