17.04.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
13.01.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.10.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.10.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.10.2009 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.10.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2009 |
First examination report |
|
21.04.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
19.05.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2005 |
Publication of search report |
published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
14.07.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
14.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
11.10.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |