EP1261021 - Method of production of circuit board, semiconductor device, and plating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi Nagano 380-0921 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mashino, Naohiro, Shinko Electric Ind. Co.Ltd 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2002/48] | Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Rinuy, Santarelli, 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291236.4 | 17.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010151027 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001151027 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1261021 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1261021 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/48 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
H05K3/423 (EP,US);
H01L21/288 (EP,US);
H01L21/2885 (EP,US);
H01L21/32115 (EP,US);
H01L21/3212 (EP,US);
H01L21/4846 (EP,US);
H01L21/486 (EP,US);
H01L21/76898 (EP,US);
H05K3/045 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L25/0657 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0376 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09563 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0143 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1509 (EP,US);
H05K3/107 (EP,US);
H05K3/388 (EP,US);
H05K3/4608 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [2006/41] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Leiterplattenherstellungsmethode, Halbleitervorrichtung und Beschichtungssystem | [2002/48] | English: | Method of production of circuit board, semiconductor device, and plating system | [2002/48] | French: | Méthode de fabrication des plaquettes de circuit imprimés, dispositif semi-conducteur et système de revêtement | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3150399 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]DD257176 (NARVA ROSA LUXEMBURG K [DD]) [A] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4766017 (HEYMANN KURT [DE], et al) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0712156 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5798298 (YANG MING-TZONG [TW], et al) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9941434 (ACM RES INC [US]) [X] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH11288940 (MOTOROLA INC) [Y] 7 * claims 1,5,6 *; | [Y]JPH11307633 (SONY CORP) [Y] 4 * claim - *; | [X]EP0973195 (ST MICROELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2344464 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [X]US6083376 (AKRAM SALMAN [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [YA]US6132586 (ADAMS JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * [A] 10,11; | [XY]CN1275802 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8 [Y] 2,2-7; | [A]EP1061578 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 5 * figure 5; example 1 *; | [Y]JP2001023989 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC) [Y] 7 * claim 8 *; | [A]US6221769 (DHONG SANG HOO [US], et al) [A] 5 * column 6, line 44 - line 47; figure 2 * * column 7, line 45 - line 55; figure 4B *; | [PA]WO0152307 (NUTOOL INC [US]) [PA] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [PA]US6300244 (ITABASHI TAKEYUKI [JP], et al) [PA] 7 * column 7, line 55 - line 58 *; | US6316359 [ ] (SIMPSON CINDY REIDSEMA [US]) [ ] * claims 1,5,6 *; | US6342447 [ ] (HOSHINO AKIRA [JP]) [ ] * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 64; figures 1,2,6 *; | [PX]US2002053730 (MASHINO NAOHIRO [JP]) [PX] 6 * the whole document *; | US2002058411 [ ] (HASEGAWA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [ ] * claim - *; | US2002119657 [ ] (GANDIKOTA SRINIVAS [US], et al); | [Y] - JAAFAR M A S ET AL, "A PLATED THROUGH-HOLE INTERCONNECT TECHNOLOGY IN SILICON", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. PRINCETON, NEW JERSEY, US, (199201), vol. 94/2, ISSN 0160-4619, page 490, XP000550868 [Y] 5,6 * the whole document * | [A] - CHIN-AN CHANG ET AL, "Carbon as a barrier for the outdiffusion of Cu", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (19890619), Database accession no. 3441060, XP002358614 [A] 7 * abstract * | [ ] - Applied Physics Letters USA, (19890619), vol. 54, no. 25, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2545 - 2547 |