EP1265056 - System for fixing a removable module to a base, and counter having such a system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/50] | Fixing system for a removable module in a circuit with a sliding latch | ||
[2017/10] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sainte-Lizaigne S.A. 47, Rue de l'Usine 36260 Sainte Lizaigne / FR | For all designated states Manufacture d'Appareillage Electrique de Cahors - MAEC Regourd 46000 Cahors / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Sainte-Lizaigne S.A. 47, Rue de l'Usine 36260 Sainte Lizaigne / FR | ||
For all designated states Manufacture D'Appareillage Electrique de Cahors - MAEC Regourd 46000 Cahors / FR | |||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Sainte-Lizaigne S.A. Tour Ariane, 5 place de la Pyramide 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
For all designated states Manufacture D'Appareillage Electrique de Cahors - MAEC Regourd 46000 Cahors / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murias, Lionel 64 avenue de la Vallée 36100 Issoudun / FR | 02 /
Verhee, Damien 54 rue du 4 Aout 36100 Issoudun / FR | 03 /
Guiomar, Yann 10 Chemin Toudats 31700 Mondonville / FR | 04 /
Charles, Jérôme St. Henri 46000 Cahors / FR | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Catherine, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291265.3 | 22.05.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | FR20010006753 | 22.05.2001 Original published format: FR 0106753 | [2002/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1265056 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01F15/18, E03B7/07, E03B7/09 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
E03B7/072 (EP);
E03B7/095 (EP);
G01F15/18 (EP);
G01F15/185 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/50] | G01F15/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2003/36] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System zur Befestigung eines austauschbaren Moduls auf einem Sockel, und Zähler mit einem solchen System | [2017/10] | English: | System for fixing a removable module to a base, and counter having such a system | [2017/10] | French: | Système de fixation sur une base d'un module amovible, et dispositif de comptage comportant un tel système | [2017/10] |
Former [2002/50] | Befestigungssystem für ein abnehmbares modul in einem Kreis mit Schiebeverriegelung | ||
Former [2002/50] | Fixing system for a removable module in a circuit with a sliding latch | ||
Former [2002/50] | Système de fixation d'un module amovible sur des circuits avec verrouillage par guillotine | Examination procedure | 11.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 14.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 17.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 01.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2241484 (SELLERS ORLIN N) [A] 1* page 2, column L, line 68 - column R, line 55; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US3929356 (DEVINCENT PATSY, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 16; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2138910 (BROOKES GEORGE, et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 65; figures 1-6 *; | [DA]FR2798182 (SAINTE LIZAIGNE SA [FR]) [DA] 1-17 * page 7, line 1 - page 13, line 6; figures 1-7 *; | [DA]FR2800401 (SAINTE LIZAIGNE SA [FR]) [DA] 1-17 * page 5, line 13 - page 10, line 10; figures 1-14 * |