EP1264562 - Device for storing and/or applying a product with fibers with absorbent or soluble particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gueret, Jean-Louis 27 avenue Raymond Poincaré 75016 Paris / FR | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François, et al Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291370.1 | 04.06.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | FR20010007308 | 05.06.2001 Original published format: FR 0107308 | [2002/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1264562 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A46B13/00, A46D1/00 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
A46D1/023 (EP,US);
A46B13/001 (EP,US);
A46D1/00 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1046 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufbewahren und Auftragen eines Produktes mit Fasern mit absorbierenden oder löslichen Partikeln | [2002/50] | English: | Device for storing and/or applying a product with fibers with absorbent or soluble particles | [2002/50] | French: | Dispositif de conditionnement et/ou d'application comprenant des fibres comportant des particules capables d'absorber un liquide ou un composé en solution dans ce liquide ou de se dissoudre dans un liquide. | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/27] | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61141307 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]US4993440 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS [FR]); | [A]US5269040 (SWITALL JEFF [US]); | [A]US5567072 (DUNLEAVY THOMAS J [US], et al); | [A]US5762432 (DUNLEAVY THOMAS J [US], et al); | [A]US6174600 (BROWN JAMES M [US], et al); | [X]EP1099394 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-14,18,20-32,35-39,42,43 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1099394 |