EP1267016 - Method for setting a tendon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entreprise Degaine 19 rue de la Lancette 75012 Paris / FR | [2010/14] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Entreprise Degaine 19 rue de la Lancette 75012 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boudoul, Robert 158 rue de Normandie 94700 Maison-Alfort / FR | 02 /
Cernesson, Patrick Le Bourg Beauvoir 50170 Pontorson / FR | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François, et al Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Tanty, François, et al Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291416.2 | 07.06.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | FR20010007729 | 13.06.2001 Original published format: FR 0107729 | [2002/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1267016 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1267016 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1267016 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04G23/02, B25D3/00, B28D1/04 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
E04G23/02 (EP);
B25D3/00 (EP);
B28D1/041 (EP);
E04G23/0218 (EP);
E04G23/0222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, IT [2003/43] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Setzen eines Zugelementes | [2002/51] | English: | Method for setting a tendon | [2002/51] | French: | Procédé de pose d'un tirant | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02190208 ; | [A]AU558428B (MARTIN P D) [A] 1* page 6, line 10 - line 22 *; | [A]DE4126825 (UPAT MAX LANGENSIEPEN KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 41 * * figure 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901016), vol. 014, no. 473, Database accession no. (M - 1035), & JP02190208 A 19900726 (KENSETSU SERVICE KK;OTHERS: 03) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5-7 * |