EP1267116 - Lighting or signalling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleury, Benoist, c/o Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2002/51] | Application number, filing date | 02291426.1 | 07.06.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | FR20010007998 | 14.06.2001 Original published format: FR 0107998 | [2002/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1267116 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/12 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
F21V13/12 (EP,US);
F21S41/145 (EP,US);
F21S41/147 (EP,US);
F21S41/151 (EP,US);
F21S41/285 (EP,US);
F21S41/321 (EP,US);
F21S41/365 (EP,US);
F21S41/40 (EP,US);
F21S41/60 (EP,US);
F21S41/686 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21S43/26 (EP,US);
F21S43/31 (EP,US);
F21S43/40 (EP,US);
F21S43/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungs- oder Signaleinrichtung | [2002/51] | English: | Lighting or signalling device | [2002/51] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage ou de signalisation | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]CH304170 (INVENTOR CREDIT ANSTALT [LI]) [X] 1,3,5-7 * page 1, line 43 - line 55 * * page 2, line 26 - line 41 * * figure 3 * [A] 14 [Y] 8-11,13; | [YA]FR2052038 (DUCELLIER & CIE) [Y] 8,10,11 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 10 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,5,6,9; | [YA]US5321586 (HEGE GUENTER [DE], et al) [Y] 13 * column 3, line 10 - line 35 * * column 4, line 30 - line 34 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 14 * * figures 1,5,6 *[A] 1,3,5-7,14; | [DYA]FR2760068 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [DY] 9 * column 12, line 12 - line 34 * * figure 6 * [A] 1,5,6 | by applicant | EP0158330 | US5084804 | WO9748134 | FR2760067 | FR2760068 | EP0949449 | EP1008801 |