EP1270277 - Transmitter of tire condition monitoring apparatus and method for manufacturing transmitter of tire condition monitoring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | [2008/15] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Yoshitaka, c/o Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | 02 /
Saheki, Setsuhiro, c/o Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | 03 /
Okubo, Youichi, c/o Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Cabinet Hirsch 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291579.7 | 25.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010195850 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001195850 | JP20020161158 | 03.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002161158 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1270277 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1270277 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1270277 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B60C23/0494 (EP,US);
B60C23/00 (KR);
B29C45/14639 (EP,US);
B60C23/0408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/23] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sender für ein Reifenüberwachungsgerät und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Senders für ein Reifenüberwachungsgerät | [2003/01] | English: | Transmitter of tire condition monitoring apparatus and method for manufacturing transmitter of tire condition monitoring apparatus | [2003/01] | French: | Emetteur pour un appareil de surveillance de condition de pneumatique et méthode de fabrication d'un émetteur pour un appareil de surveillance de condition de pneumatique | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.01.2009
22.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE BorgWarner BERU Systems GmbH Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Twelmeier Mommer & Partner, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.01.2009
22.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE BorgWarner BERU Systems GmbH Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Twelmeier Mommer & Partner, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.01.2009
Beru AG Mörikestrasse 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Twelmeier Mommer & Partner, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | 13.02.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.08.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.07.2011 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/51] | 06.07.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.07.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5040561 (ACHTERHOLT RAINER [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column 8, line 53 - line 64; figure 1 * [A] 2,3,5,6,8,10; | [XA]WO0125033 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 5; figure 2 *[A] 2,3,5,6,8,10 | by applicant | JP2000025430 |