EP1376294 - Low drop-out voltage regulator and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, TX 78735 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, Texas 78735 / US | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sicard, Thierry 5 rue Ch. Baudelaire 31270 Cugnaux / FR | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Wharmby, Martin Angus Motorola Centre de Recherche, Parc Technologique de St. Aubin, Route de L'Orme au Merisier, Immeuble Columbia 91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291605.0 | 28.06.2002 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376294 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/575, G05F1/565 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G05F1/575 (EP,US);
G05F1/565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Spannungsregulierungseinrichtung mit kleiner Verlustspannung und Verfahren | [2004/01] | English: | Low drop-out voltage regulator and method | [2004/01] | French: | Régulateur de tension à faible tension de déchet et méthode | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5889393 (WRATHALL ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US5982226 (RINCON-MORA GABRIEL A [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [XA]US6225857 (BROKAW A PAUL [US]) [X] 1-5,9,10,12-15,19-21 * the whole document * [A] 6-8,11,16-19; | [XA]US6300749 (CASTELLI CLAUDIA [IT], et al) [X] 1,11 * the whole document * [A] 2-10,12-21; | [XA]US6304131 (HUGGINS MARK WAYNE [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * the whole document * [A] 2-10,12-21; | [A]US6340918 (TAYLOR CRAIG [GB]) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [XA]US6388433 (MARTY NICOLAS [FR]) [X] 1,11 * the whole document * [A] 2-10,12-21 |