EP1280305 - Transmission path selection method and communication network therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabre, Benoît 6 Impasse du Ramier des Catalans Bât. A2 31000 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
Canela, Zoely 14bis, chemin du Plateau 91620 La Ville du Bois / FR | 03 /
Randriamasy, Claire-Sabine 68 rue de la République 92190 Meudon / FR | [2007/04] |
Former [2003/05] | 01 /
Fabre, Benoît 6 Impasse du Ramier des Catalans Bat. A2 31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
02 /
Canela, Zoely 14bis, chemin du Plateau 91620 La Ville du Bois / FR | |||
03 /
Randriamasy, Claire-Sabine 68 rue de la République 92190 Meudon / FR | Representative(s) | Chaffraix, Sylvain, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Chaffraix, Sylvain, et al Compagnie Financière Alcatel Département Propriété Industrielle 30, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291820.5 | 18.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | FR20010010001 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0110001 | [2003/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1280305 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1280305 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
H04L45/12 (EP,US);
H04L45/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragungswegeauswahl und Kommunikationssnetz dafür | [2003/05] | English: | Transmission path selection method and communication network therefore | [2003/05] | French: | Procédé de sélection de chemins de transmission et réseau de communication mettant en oeuvre ce procédé | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.06.2007 | CY | 20.06.2007 | CZ | 20.06.2007 | DK | 20.06.2007 | EE | 20.06.2007 | FI | 20.06.2007 | IE | 20.06.2007 | NL | 20.06.2007 | SK | 20.06.2007 | TR | 20.06.2007 | LU | 18.07.2007 | BE | 31.07.2007 | CH | 31.07.2007 | LI | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | BG | 20.09.2007 | SE | 20.09.2007 | GR | 21.09.2007 | ES | 01.10.2007 | PT | 20.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CY | 20.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
EE | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
LU | 18.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CY | 20.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
EE | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
EE | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
EE | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SK | 20.06.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CZ | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
BG | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 20.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BORELLA A ET AL, "IMPROVING THE COST/PERFORMANCE RATIO IN MULTICAST COMMUNICATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON NETWORKS AND OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS 2000. NOC 2000. BROADBAND ACCESS, WDM METRO AND NETWORK MANAGEMENT, PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON NETWORKS AND OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS. NOC, AMSTERDAM: IOS PRESS, (2000), vol. PRT 2 OF 2, ISBN 1-58603-068-X, pages 187 - 190, XP000993864 [A] 1-14 * page 187, lines 1-18, paragraph 1. * * page 188, paragraph 2 * | [A] - CASETTI C ET AL, "AN ADAPTIVE ROUTING ALGORITHM FOR BEST-EFFORT TRAFFIC IN INTEGRATED-SERVICES NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TELETRAFFIC CONGRESS. ITC-16. TELETRAFFIC ENGINEERING IN A COMPETITIVE WORLD. EDINBURGH, UK, JUNE 7 - 11, 1999, TELETRAFFIC SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, AMSTERDAM: ELSEVIER, NL, (19990607), vol. 3B, ISBN 0-444-50268-8, pages 1281 - 1290, XP000878159 [A] 1-14 * page 1283, lines 16-29 * |