EP1287796 - Intervertebral fusion device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biorthex Inc. 9001 Boulevard de l'Acadie, Bureau 802 Montreal, Quebec H4N 3H5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Biorthex Inc. 9001 Boulevard de l'Acadie, Bureau 802 Montreal, Quebec H4N 3H5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sicotte, Benoit 826, rue Mousseau H7X 3H8 Laval, Quebec / CA | 02 /
Leroux, Michel 4620, avenue Mariette H4B 2G2 Montreal, Quebec / CA | 03 /
Quesnel, Sylvio 7654, rue Leclerc H8N 2L9 Lasalle, Quebec / CA | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292169.6 | 03.09.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | CA20012356535 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: CA 2356535 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287796 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/446 (EP,US);
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61F2002/286 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30772 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30777 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/48] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zwischenwirbelfusionsvorrichtung | [2003/10] | English: | Intervertebral fusion device | [2003/10] | French: | Dispositif de fusion intervertébrale | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.10.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5514180 (HEGGENESS MICHAEL H [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * figures 25,26 * * column 11, line 40 - line 55 *; | [XA]US5645598 (BROSNAHAN III ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figures 4,5,10-14; claims 1,2 * [A] 7; | [XY]US5961554 (JANSON FRANK S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figures 9A-9G; claims 12-14 * * column 5, line 20 - line 30 * [Y] 3,7; | [YA]US5986169 (GJUNTER VICTOR [RU]) [Y] 3,7 * claims 1,8-10 *[A] 1; | [X]EP0979638 (DIRIK ERKAN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 6,7 * * column 5, line 28 - line 37 *; | [XA]WO0007528 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * figure 3A; claim 1 * [A] 7; | [X]US6241771 (GRESSER JOSEPH D [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * figure 1A * * column 4, line 28 - line 33 * | by applicant | US5282861 | US5986169 | WO0113969 |