EP1397014 - WIM (WAP Identification module) Primitives for handling the secure socket layer protocol (SSL) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mahalal, Ilan, c/o Schlumberger Systèmes 50, avenue Jean Jaurès, B.P. 620-12 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Cassagne, Philippe M.J. Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès BP 620 12 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Cassagne, Philippe M.J. Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès BP 620 12 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292180.3 | 04.09.2002 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1397014 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04L9/32, G07F7/10 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (EP,US);
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
H04L63/166 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L9/3234 (EP,US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
G06F2221/2153 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/49] |
Former [2004/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | WIM (WAP Identification module) Anwendungsprozeduren für Beförderung das secure socket layer protocol (SSL) | [2004/11] | English: | WIM (WAP Identification module) Primitives for handling the secure socket layer protocol (SSL) | [2004/11] | French: | Primitives WIM (WAP Identification module) pour gérer le protocole secure socket layer (SSL) | [2004/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.10.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0184761 (SWISSCOM MOBILE AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - line 30 * * page 6, line 8 - page 8, line 25 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 8 * * page 12, line 14 - line 30 * * page 14, line 11 - page 16, line 30 * * page 24, line 10 - page 27, line 27 ** figures 4,5,7 *; | [X]WO02054663 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page P2, lines 9,19-21 * * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 10 * * page 10, line 14 - page 12, line 19 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 26 * * figure 3 *; | [A] - "Wireless Transport Layer Security", WAP FORUM, (20010406), pages 1 - 106, URL: http://wapforum.org, (20021119), XP002223489 [A] 1-7 * page 17 * * page 19 * * page 35 * * pages 51-53 * * pages 72-73 * * page 78 * |