EP1414110 - Steerable antenna system with fixed feed source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMS Technologies Canada, Limited 21025 Trans Canada Highway Ste. Anne de Bellevue Québec H9X 3R2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states EMS Technologies Canada, Limited 21025 Trans Canada Highway Ste. Anne de Bellevue, Québec H9X 3R2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amyotte, Eric 330 Sylvie Laval, QC H7X 3M1 / CA | 02 /
Gimersky, Martin 1625 Lincoln Avenue No. 704 Montreal, QC H3H 2T5 / CA | 03 /
Richerd, Jean-Daniel 6281 de Saint-Vallier, No.6 Montreal, QC H2S 2P6 / CA | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 29, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292622.4 | 23.10.2002 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414110 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/19, H01Q19/185, H01Q19/10, H01Q3/20, H01Q3/08 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
H01Q19/104 (EP);
H01Q19/185 (EP);
H01Q19/192 (EP);
H01Q3/08 (EP);
H01Q3/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | Steuerbares Antennensystem mit fester Strahlungsquelle | [2004/18] | English: | Steerable antenna system with fixed feed source | [2004/18] | French: | Système d'antenne orientable avec source rayonnante fixe | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3907203 (TELEFUNKEN SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5844527 (TAKASHIMA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18 * column 1, lines 3-65; figure 1 *; | [X]US5943007 (YUJIRI MIKIO L [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10,16 * column 4, lines 4-52; figures 1,2 *; | [EL]US6492955 (AMYOTTE ERIC [CA], et al) [EL] 1-18 * the whole document ** (L:priority) * |