EP1315386 - Digital video recorder and methods for digital recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2013/27] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai A.Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubsch, Stefan Rehrener Str. 1 31559 Hohnhorst / DE | 02 /
Winter, Marco Böhmerstrasse 17 30173 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Adolph, Dirk Wallbrink 2 30952 Ronnenberg / DE | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Rittner, Karsten, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Rittner, Karsten, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Rittner, Karsten, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2003/22] | Rittner, Karsten, Dr., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 02292740.4 | 04.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | EP20010127015 | 14.11.2001 Original published format: EP 01127015 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315386 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315386 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/82 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
H04N9/8233 (EP);
H04N5/783 (EP);
H04N5/85 (EP);
H04N9/8042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/22] | Title | German: | Digitales Videoaufnahmegerät und Verfahren zur digitalen Aufnahme | [2003/22] | English: | Digital video recorder and methods for digital recording | [2003/22] | French: | Dispositif d'enregistrement vidéo numérique et procédés d'enregistrement numérique | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.07.2013 | BE | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | ES | 14.10.2013 | IE | 04.11.2013 | LU | 04.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/48] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 18.05.2013 | |
AT | 03.07.2013 | ||
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 18.05.2013 | |
AT | 03.07.2013 | ||
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 18.05.2013 | |
AT | 03.07.2013 | ||
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 04.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1111916 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7-9,11-13 * page 6, line 39 - page 9, line 2; figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO0176241 (SONY UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,4,7-13* the whole document * | Examination | EP0873022 | US5974544 | WO0115168 | by applicant | WO0115168 | EP1111916 |