EP1315404 - Illuminated display device for displaying the operating state of a system, in particular for avionics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS France 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2006/10] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states AIRBUS FRANCE 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleury, Christophe Plaine des Vidals 31340 Vacquiers / FR | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/22] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292760.2 | 06.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | FR20010014445 | 08.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114445 | [2003/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315404 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315404 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/03, G08B5/38, G08G1/097 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
G08B5/38 (EP,US);
H05B45/52 (EP,US);
H05B45/54 (EP,US);
H05B45/58 (EP,US);
H05B47/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/22] | Title | German: | Lichtinformationseinrichtung zum Anzeigen des Betriebszustandes eines Systems, insbesondere für die Avionics | [2003/22] | English: | Illuminated display device for displaying the operating state of a system, in particular for avionics | [2003/22] | French: | Dispositif d'information lumineuse concernant l'état de fonctionnement d'un système et procédé de gestion d'un tel dispositif, notamment dans le domaine avionique | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | CZ | 08.03.2006 | EE | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | IE | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | SK | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | BG | 08.06.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | LU | 06.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | CH | 30.11.2006 | LI | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
LU | 06.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1194295 (FRANZ BAUMGARTNER FABRIK ELEK) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 5 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]US3781853 (JACOBS T) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]US4298869 (OKUNO YASUO) [A] 1-12 * column 16, line 53 - column 17, line 20; figure 6B *; | [A]DE3112038 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0209269 (DON GILBERT IND INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE4208306 (VOGELSANG BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 9 - line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5717335 (LEE JEONG JUN [KR]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 6; figure 1 * |