EP1310417 - Passenger ingress and egress system for transit vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation 1001 Air Brake Avenue Wilmerding, PA 15148 / US | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oakley, Robert L. 5222 N. LeClaire Chicago, Illinois 60630 / US | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Le Bras, Hervé, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Le Bras, Hervé, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292815.4 | 12.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | US20010336777P | 12.11.2001 Original published format: US 336777 P | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1310417 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B61D23/02, B60R3/02, A61G3/06 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
A61G3/06 (EP,US);
A61G3/068 (EP,US);
B61D23/025 (EP,US);
A61G2220/12 (EP,US);
A61G2220/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/06] |
Former [2003/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einstiegs- und Ausstiegssystem für Passagiere für ein Nahverkehrsfahrzeug | [2003/20] | English: | Passenger ingress and egress system for transit vehicle | [2003/20] | French: | Système d'entrée/sortie pour passagers pour un véhicule de transport en commun | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 15.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 01.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3913497 (MAROSHICK MAX) [A] 1-13,18-24 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 52; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4168134 (POHL LEO) [A] 1-28 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 25; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE3812564 (STROBEL GUENTER [DE]) [A] 1-28* column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US5316432 (SMALLEY RAYMOND L [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 24 - line 40 * * column 5, line 13 - line 33 * * column 6, line 15 - line 37 * * column 7, line 9 - line 25; figures 3-9,16-18,27 * [A] 2-28 | by applicant | US3957284 |