EP1312744 - Power door operator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation 1001 Air Brake Avenue Wilmerding, PA 15148 / US | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oakley, Robert L. 5222 N. LeClaire Chicago, Illinois 60630 / US | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 Rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2003/21] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292832.9 | 14.11.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | US20010990999 | 14.11.2001 Original published format: US 990999 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312744 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312744 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/14 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
B61D19/02 (EP,US);
E05F15/652 (EP,US);
E05F15/655 (EP,US);
E05F17/004 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/696 (US);
E05Y2900/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/07] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Türantrieb | [2003/21] | English: | Power door operator | [2003/21] | French: | Commande de porte | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 06.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.08.2004 | IT | 18.08.2004 | [2007/38] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 18.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1235368 (G D PETERS & CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2951390 (MARTENS JACK E, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 3 - line 31; figure 5 *; | [AD]US6026697 (KRBEC MARIANNE L [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1118741 (A E ASSEMBLAGGI ELETTROMECCANI [IT]) [A] 1-8* column 5, line 55 - line 26; figures 9,10 * |