EP1319756 - Process and moulding plate used thereby, for manufacturing a road marking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alliance Petroleum Marquage 8, rue Pierre Curie 94140 Alfortville / FR | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schang, Thierry 102, avenue de la République 93140 Bondy / FR | 02 /
Lopes de Sousa, Jean 8, route de la Ferté Alais 91590 d'Huisson Longueville / FR | 03 /
Lavernhe, Jean-Marie 82, rue de la Condamine 75017 Paris / FR | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, Rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | Catherine, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/25] | Lemoine, Robert, et al Cabinet Malémont 42, Avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02293066.3 | 11.12.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | FR20010016298 | 17.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0116298 | [2003/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1319756 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1319756 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/04, B29C39/12 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
B29C39/10 (EP);
E01F9/512 (EP);
B29C2791/001 (EP);
B29C2793/0018 (EP);
B29C33/0022 (EP);
B29K2995/0021 (EP);
B29K2995/0072 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren, sowie dabei benötigte Formplatte zur Herstellung einer Strassenmarkierungsvorrichtung | [2003/25] | English: | Process and moulding plate used thereby, for manufacturing a road marking device | [2003/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif de signalisation au sol et plateau de moulage utilisé dans la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | CZ | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | EE | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | IE | 23.07.2008 | IT | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | SI | 23.07.2008 | SK | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | BG | 23.10.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | ES | 03.11.2008 | GB | 11.12.2008 | LU | 11.12.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
TR | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
GB | 11.12.2008 | ||
LU | 11.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
GB | 11.12.2008 | ||
LU | 11.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
GB | 11.12.2008 | ||
LU | 11.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
GB | 11.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
GB | 11.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 23.07.2008 | |
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8913272U (K. BRUMMERT) [Y] 7* page 8, line 4 - line 17; figure - *; | [XAY]FR2787128 (POINSIGNON PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,8 [Y] 7 |