EP1324175 - MODULE FOR SECURING DATA BY ENCRYPTION/DECRYPTION AND/OR SIGNATURE/VERIFICATION OF SIGNATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/27] | Module for securing data by encryption/decryption and/or signature/verification of signature | ||
[2018/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | [2018/25] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Bull SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states BULL S.A. 68, route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Quere, Patrick 14, allée Pierre Ronsard 91140 Villebon sur Yvette / FR | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, rue Réaumur - Boîte 10 75002 Paris / FR | [2018/25] |
Former [2014/08] | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/27] | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02293126.5 | 17.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | FR20010017043 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0117043 | [2003/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1324175 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1324175 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/72 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
G06F21/72 (EP,US);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/25] |
Former [2004/13] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MODUL ZUR DATENSICHERUNG MITTELS SCHLÜSSELUNG/ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG UND/ODER UNTERSCHRIFT/UNTERSCHRIFTSPRÜFUNG | [2018/15] | English: | MODULE FOR SECURING DATA BY ENCRYPTION/DECRYPTION AND/OR SIGNATURE/VERIFICATION OF SIGNATURE | [2018/15] | French: | MODULE DE SECURISATION DE DONNEES PAR CHIFFREMENT/DECHIFFREMENT ET/OU SIGNATURE/VERIFICATION DE SIGNATURE | [2018/15] |
Former [2003/27] | Modul zur Datensicherung mittels Schlüsselung/Entschlüsselung und/oder Unterschrift/Unterschriftsprüfung | ||
Former [2003/27] | Module for securing data by encryption/decryption and/or signature/verification of signature | ||
Former [2003/27] | Module de securisation de donnees par chiffrement/dechiffrement et/ou signature/verification de signature | Examination procedure | 22.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0076119 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * page 3, line 25 - line 32 * * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO0105086 (BROADCOM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,12 * page 3, line 1 - line 25 * * page 7, line 16 - page 9, line 30 * * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 17 * * figures 1B,2,3 *; | [A]WO0176129 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - line 22 * * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 12 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A] - BRILANTES F ET AL, "METHODS FOR ADAPTING THE SCSI INTERFACE FOR USE WITH AN ENCRYPTION MODULE", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, MOTOROLA INC. SCHAUMBURG, ILLINOIS, US, (19970901), vol. 32, ISSN 0887-5286, pages 124 - 127, XP000741157 [A] 1,3 * le document entier * | Examination | US6199121 | WO0161912 | WO0184769 | by applicant | WO0105086 |