EP1431086 - Device for changing the temperature of a medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Behr France Rouffach SAS 5, Avenue de la Gare 68250 Rouffach / FR | [2006/22] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co.KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Behr France Rouffach SAS 5, Avenue de la Gare 68250 Rouffach / FR | |||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co.KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Behr France S.A.R.L. 5, Avenue de la Gare F-68250 Rouffach / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burk, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Bubenhaldenstrasse 86 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Otto, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Elly-Heuss-Knapp-Weg 12 75428 Illingen / DE | 03 /
Mougey, Mathieu 2, rue du Ballon 68190 Ensisheim / FR | 04 /
Schmadl, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Gothaweg 12 71672 Marbach / DE | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Grauel, Andreas, Dr. BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property, Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02293207.3 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431086 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431086 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/22 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B60H1/2225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Änderung der Temperatur eines Mediums | [2004/26] | English: | Device for changing the temperature of a medium | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif pour changement de température d'un medium | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.05.2006 | EE | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | GB | 31.05.2006 | IE | 31.05.2006 | NL | 31.05.2006 | SI | 31.05.2006 | TR | 31.05.2006 | BG | 31.08.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | SE | 31.08.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | AT | 20.12.2006 | LU | 20.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | CH | 31.12.2006 | LI | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | EE | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
TR | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
AT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LU | 20.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | EE | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
AT | 20.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
AT | 20.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
AT | 20.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
AT | 20.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 31.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0876080 (REALISATIONS ET DIFFUSION POUR [FR]) [X] 1-4,8,9,11-24 * column 2, line 6 - line 10; figure -; claims 1-5,13,18 *; | [A]DE19804496 (VOIGTSBERGER HANS JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,24* abstract *; | [A]FR2801468 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [A] 1-24 * page 4, line 7 - page 6, line 16; figure - * |