EP1335291 - Power management system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware Corporation) 3000 Hanover Street Palo ALto CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Company, a Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neuman, Paul 20 rue Lesdiguières 38640 Claix / FR | 02 /
Vicard, Dominique 253 Chemin des Coralines, Cidex 65B 38190 Bernin / FR | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard Espanola, SL Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Saint Cugat del Vallés Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/33] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett-Packard France Intellectual Property Section Etablissement de Grenoble 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02354024.8 | 06.02.2002 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335291 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
G06F9/4418 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F11/1441 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/23] |
Former [2004/19] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Leistungsverwaltungssystem und -Verfahren | [2003/33] | English: | Power management system and method | [2003/33] | French: | Système et procédé de gestion de puissance | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 01.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.03.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   01.04.2004 | 25.03.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   01.04.2004 | 25.03.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   01.04.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.03.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   01.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0793175 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1,5,6,10-12 * abstract * * column 7, line 55 - column 10, line 2 * * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 4 *[A] 2-4,7-9; | [YA]US6145068 (LEWIS TIMOTHY [US]) [Y] 1,5,6,10-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 25 * * column 5 * * column 12, line 3 - line 21 * [A] 2-4,7-9 |