EP1326345 - Compact turbo-decoder with high efficiency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2003/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mejean, Philippe 43A, Quai du Drac 38600 Fontaine / FR | 02 /
Cambonie, Joel Les Echarras 38190 La Combe de Lancey / FR | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 02354196.4 | 20.12.2002 | [2003/28] | Priority number, date | FR20010016619 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0116619 | [2003/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1326345 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
H03M13/2963 (EP,US);
H03M13/2909 (EP,US);
H03M13/2948 (EP,US);
H03M13/618 (EP,US);
H03M13/6362 (EP,US);
H03M13/6561 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/14] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kompakter Turbo-Dekoder mit hoher Effizienz | [2003/28] | English: | Compact turbo-decoder with high efficiency | [2003/28] | French: | Turbo-décodeur compact à haute efficacité | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 26.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 21.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0019616 (ADVANCED HARDWARE ARCHITECTURE [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 5, line 26 - page 10, line 20 *; | [A]EP1152542 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y] - ADDE P ET AL, "DESIGN AND PERFORMANCE OF A PRODUCT CODE TURBO ENCODING-DECODING PROTOTYPE", ANNALES DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS - ANNALS OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS, PRESSES POLYTECHNIQUES ET UNIVERSITAIRES ROMANDES, LAUSANNE, CH, (199903), vol. 54, no. 3/4, ISSN 0003-4347, pages 214 - 219, XP000834643 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | Examination | US5974580 | by applicant | US5974580 | WO0019616 | - ADDE ET AL., "Design and performance of a product code turbo encoding-decoding prototype", ANNALES DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS, PRESSES POLYTECHNIQUES ET UNIVERSITAIRES ROMANDES, (199903), vol. 54, no. 3 / 4, pages 214 - 219 |