EP1238737 - Tapping unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRONIC 170 rue des Techniques 74970 Marignier / FR | [2006/35] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Choucas 170, rue des Techniques 74970 Marignier / FR | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Pronic 170, rue des Techniques 74970 Marignier / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Augis, Jean-Noël 132 allee du Clos de Diane 74300 Cluses / FR | [2010/43] |
Former [2002/37] | 01 /
Augis, Jean-Noel 132 allee du Clos de Diane 74300 Cluses / FR | Representative(s) | Poncet, Jean-François Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Poncet, Jean-François Cabinet Poncet, 7, chemin de Tillier, B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02356009.7 | 21.01.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | FR20010001534 | 30.01.2001 Original published format: FR 0101534 | [2002/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1238737 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238737 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23G1/16, B23B31/08 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
B23G1/16 (EP,US);
B23B31/08 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T408/65 (EP,US);
Y10T408/665 (EP,US);
Y10T408/6793 (EP,US);
Y10T408/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Gewindeschneideinheit | [2002/37] | English: | Tapping unit | [2002/37] | French: | Unité de taraudage | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2010 | CY | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | IE | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | LU | 21.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | BE | 31.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/26] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
LU | 21.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
LU | 21.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1369208 (BISHOP EAVES & SONS LTD) [A] * figure 2 *; | [A]GB1391176 (GUYLEE SON LTD FRANK) [A] * figure 1 *; | [XA]DE19729263 (ISKA WOLFGANG KATZ VERWALTUNGS [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 3 * * column 6, line 27 - line 67; figure 1 * [A] 2,6,10 |