EP1231316 - Laundry bag with a sliding element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guerra, Luis 68-09 Burns St. Apt E2, Forest Hills New York, NY 11375 / US | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02356013.9 | 28.01.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | US20010779077 | 08.02.2001 Original published format: US 779077 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1231316 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1231316 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1231316 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06F95/00 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
D06F95/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/33] | Title | German: | Wäschesack mit einem Gleitelement | [2002/33] | English: | Laundry bag with a sliding element | [2002/33] | French: | Sac à linge avec élément coulissant | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2004 | BE | 15.12.2004 | CH | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | FR | 15.12.2004 | LI | 15.12.2004 | NL | 15.12.2004 | TR | 15.12.2004 | CY | 28.01.2005 | IE | 28.01.2005 | LU | 28.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2005 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
LU | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
LU | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2392034 (ELLIS WILLIAM D, et al) [A] 1,5,7,9* figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3483907 (CORRIDON JULIANA M) [X] 5 * abstract *; | [PDX]US6224259 (GUERRA LUIS [US]) [PDX] 1 * filing date: Feb. 11, 2000 * the whole document * |