EP1241757 - Cable raceway element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gewiss France SA Lieudit "Le Bouleau" 21430 Liernais / FR | [2005/14] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Bailleux, Jacques 21430 Bard Le Reugulier / FR | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Hennequin, Bernard 21 rue de Valenciennes 90000 Belfort / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hennequin, Bernard 21 rue de Valenciennes 90000 Belfort / FR | [2003/33] |
Former [2002/38] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2005/14] | Myon, Gérard, et al Cabinet Lavoix, 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2002/38] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12 rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 02356049.3 | 12.03.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | FR20010003342 | 12.03.2001 Original published format: FR 0103342 | [2002/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241757 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
H02G3/0443 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Kabelkanalelement | [2002/38] | English: | Cable raceway element | [2002/38] | French: | Elément permettant de former un chemin de cables | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2599906 (METAL DEPLOYE [FR]) [A] 1,2,8* the whole document * |