EP1357576 - Highly heat-resistant plasma etching electrode and dry etching device including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8650 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Akira Kawagoe Plant, Nisshinbo Industies,Inc.,4-10,Higa shitamachi, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1114 / JP | 02 /
Tomita, Hideshi Rsrch and Dev. Center,Nisshinbo Industries,Inc.,1 -2-3, Ohnodai, Midori-ku, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | [2006/31] |
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Akira Kawagoe Plant, Nisshinbo Industies,Inc.,4-10,Higa shitamachi, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1114 / JP | ||
02 /
Tomita, Shuji Rsrch and Dev. Center,Nisshinbo Industries,Inc.,1 -2-3, Ohnodai, Midori-ku, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | Representative(s) | Moinas, Michel Cabinet Michel Moinas 13 Chemin du Levant 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Moinas, Michel Cabinet Michel Moinas 13 Chemin du Levant 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | Application number, filing date | 02356151.7 | 31.07.2002 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | JP20020118861 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002118861 | JP20020187529 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002187529 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357576 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1357576 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, C08L63/00, C08G18/09, C08K3/04 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
H01J37/3255 (EP,US);
H01L21/3065 (KR);
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
H01J37/32009 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08L2666/20 (EP,US);
C08L79/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J163/00, C08L2666/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/01] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hitzebeständige Elektrode zum Plasmaätzen, und Plasmaätzvorrichtung mit dieser Elektrode | [2003/44] | English: | Highly heat-resistant plasma etching electrode and dry etching device including the same | [2003/44] | French: | Electrode résistante à la chaleur pour décapage à plasma, et dispositif pour décapage à plasma comportant celle-ci | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 27.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000290468 ; | [A]JPH0616907 ; | [A]JPH09241353 ; | [A]US5079326 (SUZUKI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 52-54 * * column 13, line 35 - column 14, line 65 * * column 5, lines 14,15 *; | [A]US5223584 (LENKE GERD M [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, lines 38-58 * * column 7, line 23 - column 13, line 50 *; | [A]US5576398 (TAKAHASHI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 22 * * column 8, line 5 - column 10, line 45 *; | [A]EP0803897 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [A] 1,10-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 49; figures 1,5 *; | [A]EP0928825 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0037] *; | [A]EP0943642 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0001] , [0049] *; | [X]US2002043335 (YAMAGUCHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0014] - [0059]; figure 1; example 8; claims 1-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000290468 A 20001017 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0017] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940421), vol. 018, no. 222, Database accession no. (C - 1193), & JP06016907 A 19940125 (NISSHINBO IND INC;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0014] , [0023] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09241353 A 19970916 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0010] , [0013] * |