Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP1317913


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.07.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  08.09.2004  [2004/37]
11.05.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
11.05.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
03.04.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
19.01.2004 Definitive list of designations published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
15.01.2004 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
15.01.2004 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
25.04.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.06.2003  [2003/24]