blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1317913

EP1317913 - Vehicle equipment for transferring and locking a seat capable of being transformed into a wheelchair for a handicapped person [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baboulin, Thierry
Zone Industrielle de Cornage
38220 Vizille / FR
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Baboulin, Thierry
7, rue René Thomas
38130 Echirolles / FR
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Maureau, Philippe, et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU
12, rue de la République
42000 Saint Etienne / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Maureau, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau, 12 rue de la République
42000 Saint Etienne / FR
Application number, filing date02356252.305.12.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateFR2001001607610.12.2001         Original published format: FR 0116076
[2003/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317913
Date:11.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:A61G3/06, A61G3/02
[2003/24]
CPC:
A61G3/02 (EP); A61G3/062 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/10]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugausrüstung zur Verlagerung und gesicherten Befestigung eines in einen Rollstuhl umwandelbaren Sitzes[2003/24]
English:Vehicle equipment for transferring and locking a seat capable of being transformed into a wheelchair for a handicapped person[2003/24]
French:Equipement de véhicule pour assurer le transfert et la fixation verrouillée d'un siège transformable en fauteuil roulant pour handicapé[2003/24]
Examination procedure12.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/37]
08.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004SI   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.01.2004M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2456002  (RUIZ SA EXPL ATEL ANDRE) [A] 1 * page 11, line 32 - line 38; figure - *;
 [A]US4457663  (HEMS COLIN E [GB], et al) [A] 1* column 5, line 54 - line 61; figure - *;
 [A]FR2599314  (CORAM [FR]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 23 - line 27; figure - *;
 [AD]FR2756729  (THIERRY BABOULIN [FR]) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *
by applicantFR2756729
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.